Estate of Don Rust et al v. EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Don Rust, Gina Rust and John Rust
Defendant: EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance, Trip Mate, Inc. and Trip Mate Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00916
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Case Terminated per #9 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. (kah)
September 2, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance, Trip Mate Inc. (Meiners, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Kyrah Brandt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Travel Insurance Policy)(Meiners, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party . (Meiners, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party by EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance. (Meiners, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Trip Mate Inc.(Meiners, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wallace, Justin)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Wallace, Justin)
August 11, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: Punctuation and addresses removed from party names - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Corrected demand amount. The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah C Meiners on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Deborah C. Meiners (Meiners, Deborah)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance, Trip Mate, Inc. from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2022CV675 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4182676) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Shannon) Modified on 8/11/2022 (amb).
August 10, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Don Rust et al v. EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Don Rust
Represented By: Justin F Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Rust
Represented By: Justin F Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rust
Represented By: Justin F Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Europ Assistance and GGA General Globe Assistance
Represented By: Deborah C Meiners
Represented By: Shannon A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trip Mate, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah C Meiners
Represented By: Shannon A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trip Mate Inc
Represented By: Shannon A Allen
Represented By: Deborah C Meiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?