Tallman v. Guglar et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Donald Tallman
Defendant: Bonnie Guglar, Renee Schuller, Captain Hartzheim and Seg Sgt 2nd Shift
Case Number: 2:2022cv01011
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL 1983 Information by Dylan Donald Tallman. (tlf)
September 27, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $9.00, receipt number GB4689-271PORB4 pay.gov; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/16/2022. On or before 10/7/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $9.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Dylan Tallman at Dodge Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 7, 2022 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. Notice mailed to plaintiff. (amb)
September 7, 2022 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dylan Donald Tallman. (lh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dylan Donald Tallman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (edr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dylan Donald Tallman. (edr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Dylan Donald Tallman. (edr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tallman v. Guglar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Donald Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Guglar
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Schuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hartzheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seg Sgt 2nd Shift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?