Shanaphy v. Kohls Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sean Shanaphy
Defendant: Kohls Corporation, Michelle Gass, Jill Timm, Michael Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H Charles Floyd, Margaret Jenkins, Thomas Kingsbury, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira and Stephanie A Streeter
Petitioner: Thomas Frame, Robert Adams and Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan
Case Number: 2:2022cv01016
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #27 Reply Brief in Support of Motion filed by Thomas Frame ; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
December 6, 2022 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Tuccillo in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vienna Forest Certificate of Formation Limited Partnership, #2 Exhibit B- Vienna Forest LP Tax Public Information Reports, #3 Exhibit C- Vienna Forest Management LLC Certificate of Formation, #4 Exhibit D- Wienaa Forest Management LLC Tax Public Information Reports, #5 Exhibit E- Damages Analysis - Thomas Frame, #6 Exhibit F - Certification of Thomas Frame)(Tuccillo, Matthew)
December 6, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Tuccillo, Matthew)
December 6, 2022 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Further Support of Mr. Frame's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Cert of formation Vienna Forest, LP, #2 Exhibit B, Cert of formation Vienna Forest Management, LLC)(Miller, Kim)
December 6, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Thomas Frame re #11 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Frame as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Miller, Kim)
November 28, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Tuccillo on behalf of Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew L. Tuccillo (Tuccillo, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Tuccillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 11, 2022 Letter sent by Pomerantz, #2 Exhibit B - November 21, 2022 Letter sent by KSF)(Tuccillo, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Tuccillo, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Further Support of Mr. Frame's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/11/22 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 11/21/22 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Supplemental Frame Declaration)(Wagner, K)
November 22, 2022 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Thomas Frame re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel and in Further Support of Mr. Frame's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Counsel. (Wagner, K)
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E Miller on behalf of Thomas Frame. Attorney(s) appearing: Kim E. Miller (Miller, Kim)
November 4, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by Robert Adams of Withdrawal of Motion to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Dkt. No. 14) (Kim, Phillip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support of Motion Of The Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Damages Analysis, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 1, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim in Support of Motion of Robert Adams for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Dkt. No. 14) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rosen Law Firm Resume)(Kim, Phillip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Robert Adams re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. MOTION to Appoint Robert Adams as Lead Plaintiff . (Kim, Phillip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., MOTION to Appoint Robert Adams as Lead Plaintiff by Robert Adams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in support of Thomas Frame's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of his Selection of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, PSLRA Certificate, #2 Exhibit B, Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C, Statutory Notice, #4 Exhibit D, Frame Declaration, #5 Exhibit E, KSF Firm Resume)(Wagner, K)
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Thomas Frame re #11 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Frame as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Wagner, K)
November 1, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Frame as Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas Frame. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, K)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Smith on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Colleen C. Smith (Smith, Colleen)
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D Johnson on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Michele D. Johnson (Johnson, Michele)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John L Kirtley on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: John L. Kirtley (Kirtley, John)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Wuest on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew M. Wuest (Wuest, Matthew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Carrino, Christie)
October 28, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Scheduling Order Related to Pleadings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Scheduling Order Related to Pleadings)(Carrino, Christie)
October 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie B Carrino on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Christie B. Carrino (Carrino, Christie)
September 29, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sean Shanaphy. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 27, 2022 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sean Shanaphy. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Michael Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H. Charles Floyd, Michelle Gass, Margaret Jenkins, Thomas Kingsbury, Kohls Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E. Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira, Stephanie A. Streeter, Jill Timm by Sean Shanaphy. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4201945) (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 2, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lz)
September 2, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanaphy v. Kohls Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Shanaphy
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Corporation
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gass
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Timm
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bender
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Boneparth
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yael Cosset
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Day
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Charles Floyd
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Jenkins
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kingsbury
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbin Mitchell
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas Prising
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Schlifske
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianne Shapira
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie A Streeter
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Frame
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Represented By: Kim E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Adams
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Matthew L Tuccillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?