Ibrahim et al v. The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Maher Ibrahim, Sabrina Ibrahim, Sonya Audi, Christina Slater and Mary Ibrahim
Defendant: The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Champion Care, LLC, JB Kenosha Healthcare, LLC, Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services, The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation LLC, Champion Care LLC and JB Kenosha Healthcare LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01116
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Huddleston Baker, Samantha)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/1/2022 re #5 Joint Stipulation and #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Subrogated Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation and GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiffs to file a response to the subrogated party defendant's motion to dismiss is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 11, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subrogated Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order to Extend Time to Respond to Subrogated Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Ovbiagele, Ohioma)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiffs Time to Respond to Subrogated Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Ovbiagele, Ohioma)
October 14, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ovbiagele, Ohioma)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Supplemental Summons and Complaint, #2 Submission of Unpublished Opinion, #3 Decision and Order)(Flaherty, Maura)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flaherty, Maura)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services from Racine County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20-CV-970 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Supplemental Summons and Complaint)(Flaherty, Maura)
September 23, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibrahim et al v. The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Maher Ibrahim
Represented By: Samantha C Huddleston Baker
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Ibrahim
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Represented By: Samantha C Huddleston Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Audi
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Represented By: Samantha C Huddleston Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Slater
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Represented By: Samantha C Huddleston Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ibrahim
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Represented By: Samantha C Huddleston Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Kenosha Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bay at Burlington Health and Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Kenosha Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?