In re Advocate Aurora Health Pixel Litigation
Plaintiff: Shyanne John and Angelica Hudy
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc. and Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Richard Webster and Deanna Danger
Case Number: 2:2022cv01253
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/22/2022; GRANTING #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. IT IS ORDERED that Gary Klinger of Milberg, Coleman, Bryson,Phillips, Grossman, PLLC, and Terence R. Coates of Markovits, Stock &DeMarco, LLC be and the same are hereby APPOINTED as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for all Plaintiffs. See Order for details. (cc: all counsel)(bx)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/16/2022. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J Oesch on behalf of Advocate Aurora Health Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Nathan Oesch (Oesch, Nathan)
December 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Splitek on behalf of Advocate Aurora Health Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew Splitek (Splitek, Matthew)
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin C Foster on behalf of Advocate Aurora Health Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristin C. Foster (Foster, Kristin)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Advocate Aurora Health Inc. (Conley, Daniel)
December 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Conley on behalf of Advocate Aurora Health Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel E. Conley (Conley, Daniel)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Deanna Danger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bleichner, Bryan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard Webster. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lyon, Joseph)
December 14, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
November 30, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (rcm)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/29/2022. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Docket #4 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The three presently pending actions shall be consolidated for pre-trial purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a) (hereafter the Consolidated Action). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all papers filed in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under Case No. 22-CV-1253, the number assigned to the first- filed case, and shall bear the following caption: In re Advocate Aurora Health Pixel Litigation.(cc: all counsel)(rcm)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) by Angelica Hudy, Shyanne John. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Klinger/Milberg Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Markovits Stock DeMarco Resume, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Angelica Hudy, Shyanne John. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Angelica Hudy, Shyanne John. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Klinger, Gary)
October 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to Advocate Aurora Health Inc. (rcm)
October 25, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Angelica Hudy, Shyanne John. (Klinger, Gary)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand; against Advocate Aurora Health, Inc. by Shyanne John, Angelica Hudy. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4240688) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Klinger, Gary)
October 24, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Advocate Aurora Health Pixel Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyanne John
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: David Lietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Hudy
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: David Lietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Splitek
Represented By: Nathan J Oesch
Represented By: Kristin C Foster
Represented By: Daniel E Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Webster
Represented By: Terence R Coates
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lyon
Represented By: Dylan J Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deanna Danger
Represented By: Philip J Krzeski
Represented By: Bryan L Bleichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?