Lindsey et al v. Cherokee Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Joe N Lindsey, Sr, Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc and State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc, B&E Logistics LLC, ABC Insurance Corporation, Wesley James Ray, B&G Logistics LLC and Wesley James May
Case Number: 2:2022cv01295
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER from Attorney John J. Hansen Regarding Default Judgment. (Hansen, John)
December 29, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. by Joe N Lindsey, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John J. Hansen, #2 Exhibit A of Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B of Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, John)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/2/2022. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall AMEND the party names on the docket to reflect the updates noted herein. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Allison M. Welch in Support of Motion to Dismiss DHS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service DHS)(Welch, Allison)
December 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Party State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal Order DHS)(Welch, Allison)
December 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison M Welch on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Allison M. Welch (Welch, Allison)
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Amend Caption and Properly Name Defendants by Joe N Lindsey, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, John)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Amend Caption and Properly Name Parties by Joe N Lindsey, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joe N Lindsey, Sr. (Hansen, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joe N Lindsey, Sr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hansen, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by B&E Logistics LLC, Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc, Wesley James Ray.(Stanaszak, Steven)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/4/2022. (cc: all counsel) (gap)
November 2, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by B&E Logistics LLC, Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc, Wesley James Ray. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Roberts on behalf of B&E Logistics LLC, Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc, Wesley James Ray. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael K. Roberts (Roberts, Michael)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B&E Logistics LLC, Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc, Wesley James Ray (Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by B&E Logistics LLC. (Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc. (Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company. (Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by B&E Logistics LLC, Wesley James Ray, Cherokee Insurance Company, M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-CV-000988 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4248319) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. B-Jury Demand, #3 Ex. C-Conf. Order & Notice of Sched. Conf., #4 Ex. D-Inv. Pl. Not. of Appearance, Prop. Order to Dismiss, & Cert. of Service, #5 Ex. E-Defs.' Not. of Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stanaszak, Steven)
November 2, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey et al v. Cherokee Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe N Lindsey, Sr
Represented By: John J Hansen
Represented By: Nicholas E Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Allison M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C. Van Kampen Trucking Inc
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&E Logistics LLC
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley James Ray
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Logistics LLC
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley James May
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?