Dev Management LLC v. Patel
Plaintiff: Dev Management, LLC and Dev Management LLC
Defendant: Manishkumar M Patel and Manishkumar Patel
Case Number: 2:2022cv01302
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Affidavit ; The incorrect event was chosen. In the future please use the SUMMONS Returned Executed event when service of the summons is achieved; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dev Management LLC. Manishkumar Patel served on 11/29/2022. AFFIDAVIT of Roger Burton for Personal Service on Manishkumar Patel. (Koehnke, Christopher) Modified on 12/8/2022 (rcm).
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dev Management LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Koehnke, Christopher)
December 2, 2022 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (rcm)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/4/2022. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
November 4, 2022 Summons Issued as to Manishkumar Patel. (rcm)
November 4, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The disclosure statement should be filed as a separate document and not as an attachment to the initiating document. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit B - Escrow Agreement by Dev Management, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Koehnke, Christopher)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A - Agreement of Purchase and Sale by Dev Management, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Koehnke, Christopher)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manishkumar M Patel by Dev Management, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4249818) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure)(Koehnke, Christopher)
November 3, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dev Management LLC v. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dev Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T Koehnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dev Management LLC
Represented By: Christopher T Koehnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manishkumar M Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manishkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?