Danger v. Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Plaintiff: Deanna Danger
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc. and Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv01305
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller due to lead case being with Judge J P Stadtmueller. Judge Brett H Ludwig no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/29/2022. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Docket #4 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The three presently pending actions shall be consolidated for pre-trial purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a) (hereafter the Consolidated Action). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all papers filed in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under Case No. 22-CV-1253, the number assigned to the first- filed case, and shall bear the following caption: In re Advocate Aurora Health Pixel Litigation.(cc: all counsel)(rcm)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Advocate Aurora Health Inc, Deanna Danger. (rcm)
November 4, 2022 Summons Issued as to Advocate Aurora Health, Inc. (vkb)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Deanna Danger (Bleichner, Bryan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Advocate Aurora Health, Inc. by Deanna Danger. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4249961) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bleichner, Bryan)
November 3, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danger v. Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Danger
Represented By: Bryan L Bleichner
Represented By: Philip J Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?