Franks v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jordan Franks
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2022cv01383
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 18 Plaintiffs Brief by Jordan Franks. (Duncan, Dana)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/2/2022 re #16 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 29, 2022; the time for the defendant to file her response is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 13, 2023; the time for the plaintiff to file any reply is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 27, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Jordan Franks. (Duncan, Dana)
November 30, 2022 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jordan Franks. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/22/2022 re #13 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 2, 2022; the time for the defendant to file her brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 16, 2023; the time for the plaintiff to file any reply is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 31, 2023. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Jordan Franks. (Duncan, Dana)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jordan Franks. (Duncan, Dana)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-00426. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Change of Venue. It is ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, where it should have been filed in the first place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/21/2022. (rks) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Change of Venue by Plaintiff Jordan Franks. Response due 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Specialist Affidavit for Motion for Change of Venue for Ca) (Duncan, Dana) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
November 21, 2022 Attorney Mona Ahmed and Albert Bianchi, Jr terminated for Kilolo Kijakazi. (blr)
November 21, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Brief in Support due 11/21/2022. Brief in Opposition due 1/5/2023. Brief in Reply due 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Social Security Hearing Transcript Part 2) (Bianchi, Albert) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Bianchi, Albert) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by David Levitt for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Levitt, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Duncan, Dana) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2022. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jordan Franks. (Duncan, Dana) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi., filed by Jordan Franks. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Duncan, Dana) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Franks
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: David Levitt
Represented By: Mona Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?