The Huntington National Bank v. Lighthart Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Lighthart Enterprises LLC, Lighthart HVAC Inc, Daniel Lighthart, Lauren Lighthart, D. R. Kohlman, Inc., Mary Jo Neumann and D R Kohlman Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv01406
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by D R Kohlman Inc. (Schneider, Troy)
December 28, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to D R Kohlman Inc that Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (rcm)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy R Schneider on behalf of D R Kohlman Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Troy R. Schneider (Schneider, Troy)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Notice of Claim for Surplus by D R Kohlman Inc.(Schneider, Troy)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 11/29/2022. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 NO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION AVAILABLE; Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Huntington National Bank. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hendricksen, Matthew) Modified on 12/6/2022 (rcm).
November 29, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
November 29, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Hendricksen on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew L. Hendricksen (Hendricksen, Matthew)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Huntington National Bank. (Hendricksen, Matthew)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by The Huntington National Bank. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4266417) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Daniel Lighthart, #4 Summons D.R. Kohlman, #5 Summons Lauren Lighthart, #6 Summons Lighthart Enterprises, #7 Summons Lighthart HVAC, #8 Summons Mary Jo Neumann)(Hendricksen, Matthew)
November 28, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; ; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) Modified on 12/5/2022 (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Huntington National Bank v. Lighthart Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Matthew L Hendricksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthart Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthart HVAC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lighthart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Lighthart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. R. Kohlman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jo Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D R Kohlman Inc
Represented By: Troy R Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?