Hopkins v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lloyd Hopkins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv01429
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Filing 9 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/11/23. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 1/11/23 granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from plaintiff Lloyd Hopkins re: motion to dismiss and asking how the case can be returned to state court (vkb)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Social Security Administration re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Pawlak, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Social Security Administration. (Pawlak, Brian)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/8/2022. Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Lloyd Hopkins)(jm)
December 7, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Actions by Social Security Administration (rcm)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Social Security Administration from Racine County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-SC-3090 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Related Actions, #4 Letter to Clerk enclosing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(Pawlak, Brian)
November 30, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?