PBE Wireless Inc v. Eagle Drones LLC et al
Plaintiff: PBE Wireless Inc
Defendant: Eagle Drones, LLC, Rodney Murray and Eagle Drones LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00036
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2023 Case Terminated per #21 . (rcm)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/27/2023: ADOPTING #20 Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 27, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by PBE Wireless Inc. (Squire, Percy)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/10/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff and Defendants promptly meet and confer regarding the jurisdictional issues raised in this Order. By 6/28/2023, Plaintiff and Defendants each shall FILE a supplemental brief with respect to same. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
May 1, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Levine, Robert)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion filed by PBE Wireless Inc re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction IN OPPOSITION WITH CORRECT AFFIDAVIT. (Attachments: #1 EX A. UNPAID PURCHASE ORDERS, #2 EX B. PETERS AFFIDAVIT (Correct), #3 EX C. GREENTREE INVOICES)(Squire, Percy)
April 16, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed by PBE Wireless Inc re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction IN OPPOSITION. (Attachments: #1 EX A. UNPAID PURCHASE ORDERS, #2 EX B. PETERS AFFIDAVIT, #3 EX C. GREENTREE INVOICES)(Squire, Percy)
March 24, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Exhibit A - Ltr to Plaintiff counsel 3 21 23)(Levine, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray. (Levine, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Levine, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray. (Levine, Robert)
March 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Levine on behalf of Eagle Drones LLC, Rodney Murray. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert A. Levine and Jonathan J. Cattey (Levine, Robert)
March 23, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by PBE Wireless Inc.(Squire, Percy)
March 15, 2023 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PBE Wireless Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Squire, Percy)
March 15, 2023 THIRD NOTICE from the clerk to PBE Wireless Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. The Notice that was filed (ECF No. #6 ) is Incomplete and does not contain the name of the Magistrate Judge in the document. If you have any issues or problems please contact the clerk's office. (rcm)
March 14, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER from Percy Squire to Eagle Drones, LLC re. Magistrate Refusal/Consent. (Squire, Percy)
March 14, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by PBE Wireless Inc. (Squire, Percy)
March 14, 2023 Filing 6 INCOMPLETE Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PBE Wireless Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Squire, Percy) Modified on 3/15/2023 (rcm).
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PBE Wireless Inc. Rodney Murray served on 3/7/2023. (Squire, Percy)
March 9, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PBE Wireless Inc. Eagle Drones LLC served on 3/7/2023. (Squire, Percy)
March 6, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PBE Wireless Inc. Eagle Drones LLC served on 3/3/2023. (Squire, Percy)
February 15, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
February 15, 2023 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (rcm)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 1/17/2023. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
January 11, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by PBE Wireless Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4298249) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Eagle Drone, #3 Summons Rodney Murray)(Squire, Percy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PBE Wireless Inc v. Eagle Drones LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBE Wireless Inc
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Drones, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Murray
Represented By: Robert A Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Drones LLC
Represented By: Robert A Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?