Lund v. Cromwell
Petitioner: Todd M Lund
Respondent: Warden Cromwell
Case Number: 2:2023cv00090
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/9/2023. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Todd Lund at Redgranite Correctional Institution)(cb)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/9/2023. Habeas petition DISMISSED for failure to state claim and as untimely. The court DECLINES to issue certificate of appealability. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Todd Lund at Redgranite Correctional Institution)(cb)
February 7, 2023 FILING FEE Received: $5.00, receipt number 91573. (jcl)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Todd M Lund. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
January 24, 2023 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (amb)
January 23, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Todd M Lund. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lund v. Cromwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd M Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Cromwell
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?