Perez et al v. Guetschow et al
Plaintiff: Jerrel Perez and Jane Doe
Defendant: Shawn Guetschow, City of Kenosha and Kenosha Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2023cv00153
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Colin J. Casper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Colin J. Casper, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Colin J. Casper)(Casper, Colin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Kenosha re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Casper, Colin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Kenosha. (Casper, Colin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City of Kenosha. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Casper, Colin)
February 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin T Woehl on behalf of City of Kenosha. Attorney(s) appearing: Dustin T. Woehl (Woehl, Dustin)
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin J Casper on behalf of City of Kenosha. Attorney(s) appearing: Colin J. Casper (Casper, Colin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeVinney, Drew)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. City of Kenosha served on 2/10/2023. (DeVinney, Drew)
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shawn Guetschow, Kenosha Unified School District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hall, Samuel)
February 15, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to Shawn Guetschow, Kenosha Unified School District requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (edr)
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenosha Unified School District - Waiver sent on 2/8/2023. (Hall, Samuel)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shawn Guetschow - Waiver sent on 2/8/2023. (Hall, Samuel)
February 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C McGaver on behalf of Shawn Guetschow, Kenosha Unified School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Steve C. McGaver (McGaver, Steven)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Shawn Guetschow, Kenosha Unified School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
February 7, 2023 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (edr)
February 7, 2023 Summons Issued as to City of Kenosha, Shawn Guetschow, Kenosha Unified School District. (edr)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jerrel Perez, Jane Doe. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4318600) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DeVinney, Drew)
February 6, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Guetschow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrel Perez
Represented By: Drew J DeVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Drew J DeVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Guetschow
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kenosha
Represented By: Colin J Casper
Represented By: Dustin T Woehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?