McCabe v. 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc
Plaintiff: Melissa McCabe
Defendant: 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. and 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00257
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 American Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. (Aizenberg, Aaron)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 4/10/2023. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
April 7, 2023 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
April 7, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Melissa McCabe. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sweet, Benjamin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Prinsen, Benjamin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron H Aizenberg on behalf of 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron H. Aizenberg (Aizenberg, Aaron)
April 7, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to plaintiff and defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
April 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Prinsen on behalf of 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Benjamin R. Prinsen (Prinsen, Benjamin)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc - Waiver sent on 4/4/2023. (Sweet, Benjamin)
February 24, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
February 24, 2023 Summons Issued as to 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. (amb)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Marie Bernal on behalf of Melissa McCabe. Attorney(s) appearing: Alison M. Bernal (Bernal, Alison)
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Melissa McCabe. (Sweet, Benjamin)
February 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc. by Melissa McCabe. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4333857) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sweet, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa McCabe
Represented By: Benjamin J Sweet
Represented By: Alison Marie Bernal
Represented By: Jonathan D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Stop Electronics Center Inc
Represented By: Aaron H Aizenberg
Represented By: Benjamin Prinsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?