United States v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Richard J Clark, Mary Ann Clark, Camile E Proszek and Amber R Clark
Case Number: 2:2023cv00370
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 INCOMPLETE Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard J Clark. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Amber R Clark. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Camile E Proszek. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary Ann Clark. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
April 11, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by United States re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time (unopposed). (Bresnahan, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Mary Ann Clark. (jcl)
April 10, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Amber R Clark served on 4/3/2023. (Bresnahan, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Camile E Proszek served on 4/3/2023. (Bresnahan, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Mary Ann Clark served on 4/3/2023. (Bresnahan, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Richard J Clark served on 4/3/2023. (Bresnahan, James)
March 29, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (vkb)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bresnahan, James)
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Bresnahan, II on behalf of United States. Attorney(s) appearing: James F. Bresnahan II (Bresnahan, James)
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amber Clark Proposed Summons, #3 Summons Mary Ann Clark Proposed Summons, #4 Summons Richard J Clark Proposed Summons, #5 Summons Camile Proszek Proposed Summons)(Bresnahan, James)
March 22, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: James Francis Bresnahan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camile E Proszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber R Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?