Grzyb v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Tyler Grzyb
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv00625
Filed: May 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Tsui on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Judy Tsui (Tsui, Judy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
May 18, 2023 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by July 17, 2023;. (cc: all counsel) (jmk)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee signed by Judge William C Griesbach on May 18, 2023. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
May 18, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (jmk)
May 17, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tyler Grzyb. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
May 17, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tyler Grzyb. (Duncan, Dana)
May 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tyler Grzyb. (Duncan, Dana)
May 17, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Tyler Grzyb (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)
May 17, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (amh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grzyb v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Grzyb
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Judy Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?