Baker et al v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Phyllis Baker and Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund d/b/a Humana Insurance Company
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01066
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/4/2023. Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/15/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2024. Written Discovery to be served by 8/15/2024. Defendants Expert Witness List due by 9/15/2024. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/16/2024.The court will schedule a telephonic scheduling conference to discuss further scheduling if no summary judgment motions are filed or if resolution of the summary judgment motions does not dispose of the case in its entirety. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
October 4, 2023 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/4/2023. Case deadlines set. Scheduling order to issue. Clarifications made to record: (1) ECF No. 13 is Withdrawn; (2) ECF No. 17 is Moot due to withdrawing of ECF No 13; (3) ECF No 21 is modified to strike the language that Wisconsin Masons' Health Care Fund is terminated; it remains a pending party; (4) "d/b/a Humana Insurance Company" to be added to docket for Wisconsin Masons' Health Care Fund; (5) Steven G Kluender terminated as counsel for Wisconsin Masons' Health Care Fund; (6) Cross-defendant Phyllis Baker is a pending party; termination date to be removed. (Tape #Zoom audio 9:34-9:51 am) (lz)
September 25, 2023 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Walmart Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/25/2023. The motion of Wisconsin Masons' Health Care Fund to withdraw its answer (ECF No. #20 ) is GRANTED. Wisconsin Masons' Health Care Fund is terminated as a party. (cc: all counsel)(lz) Modified on 10/4/2023 (lz).
September 22, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Order to Withdraw Answer by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kluender, Steven)
September 11, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. Because the case has been reassigned to Judge Duffin on consent, the Scheduling Conference set for November 20, 2023 at 11:15 AM before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper is REMOVED from the court's calendar; the November 6, 2023 deadline for the parties to file a Rule 26(f) report is VACATED. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/11/2023. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 11, 2023 Filing 17 DOCUMENT IS MOOT per withdrawing of ECF No 13... ANSWER to Crossclaim re #13 filed by Walmart Inc. (Fons, Lynette) Modified on 10/4/2023 (lz).
September 11, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #11 filed by Walmart Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
September 11, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 669-254-5252. When prompted, use meeting ID 160 9647 6949# and # again and then enter passcode 943682# to join the call. A Rule 26(f) report shall be filed by 9/27/2023. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. (Kluender, Steven)
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kluender, Steven)
September 8, 2023 Filing 13 WITHDRAWN See Court's Order ECF No 21 ANSWER to Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against Phyllis Baker filed by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund.(Kluender, Steven) Modified on 10/4/2023 (lz).
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G Kluender on behalf of Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven Kluender (Kluender, Steven)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 CLAIM and Cross-Claim by Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. (Rexroat, Christopher)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Rexroat on behalf of Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher L. Rexroat (Rexroat, Christopher)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (amb)
August 31, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Dunn, Tony)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dunn, Tony)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony M Dunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Tony M. Dunn (Dunn, Tony)
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Walmart Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fons, Lynette)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/17/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 222, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 11/6/2023. (cc: all counsel)(cb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/17/2023) (cb).
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.(Fons, Lynette)
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynette Fons on behalf of Walmart Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Carlos R. Pastrana (Fons, Lynette)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 23-CV-676 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number BWIEDC-4470828) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.) Return of Service, Summons, Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fons, Lynette)
August 10, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Baker
Represented By: John V O'Connor
Represented By: Tony M Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund d/b/a Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher L Rexroat
Represented By: Steven G Kluender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Lynette Fons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?