Anderson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Melissa A Anderson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv01084
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Kilolo Kijakazi (Pawlak, Brian)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
August 22, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 10/17/2023;Plaintiff's brief due 11/16/2023;Defendant's response due 12/16/2023;Plaintiff's reply due 12/30/2023. (cc: all counsel) (kmr)
August 18, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (edr)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 08/16/23 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Melissa A Anderson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Melissa A Anderson. (Chewning, Donald)
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Melissa A Anderson. (Chewning, Donald)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Melissa A Anderson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appeals Council denial, #3 ALJ decision)(Chewning, Donald)
August 15, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A Anderson
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?