Gould v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Christina Gould
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv01121
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Han on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Lu Han (Han, Lu)
August 29, 2023 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 10/30/2023;Plaintiff's brief due 11/29/2023;Defendant's response due 12/29/2023;Plaintiff's reply due 1/12/2024. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
August 29, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/28/2023. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/25/2023 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christina Gould. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Christina Gould. (Brzezinski, James)
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christina Gould. (Brzezinski, James)
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Christina Gould (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brzezinski, James)
August 24, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (amh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gould
Represented By: James M Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Lu Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?