Padua v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jada M. Padua and Jada M Padua
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv01126
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/20/2023 re #21 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The court FINDS that the defendant has shown good cause and GRANTS her motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file her brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 27, 2023; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 11, 2023. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 19, 2023 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jean Godfrey in Support of First Extension Motion to File Defendant's Brief (Godfrey, Jean)
October 19, 2023 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Jean)
October 19, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey (Godfrey, Jean)
September 27, 2023 Filing 19 Plaintiffs Brief by Jada M Padua. (Brown, James)
August 28, 2023 Filing 18 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties: Plaintiff's brief due 9/27/2023;Defendant's response due 10/27/2023;Plaintiff's reply due 11/10/2023. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 28, 2023 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03846. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 25, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to both parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
August 21, 2023 Filing 15 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division the electronic record. (kl, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 8/18/2023: Emailed notice (yt) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant's Agreed Motion for Change of Venue #12 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (yt) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi to change venue (Agreed) (Raedy, Valerie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raedy, Valerie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez for ruling on final disposition of this previously remanded case. The parties are directed to review the LR 16.4 Scheduling in Social Security Cases available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and this Court's Standing Order in Social Security Cases. No further order will be entered regarding setting dates for a briefing schedule. Mailed notice (lp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Thomas M. Durkin no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/29/2023. (axk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. This case will be sent to the Executive Committee for reassignment. All pending dates before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Valerie Rebecca Raedy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Raedy, Valerie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should consult with each other by 7/5/2023 to determine whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they should file a joint statement of consent pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(a). Otherwise, pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint or the administrative record. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 4 The parties are required to provide notice of any prior case filed by Plaintiff that resulted in a remand for further administrative proceedings. If there was a prior remanded case that is not identified on the Civil Cover Sheet in this action, the parties are ordered to file a Notification of the prior case within 30 days. That Notification is to provide the case name, number and assigned judge. (jb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 21, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 21, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 19, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jada M Padua by James P. Brown (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]
June 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jada M Padua; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20748310.(Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/25/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padua v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada M. Padua
Represented By: James P Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada M Padua
Represented By: James P Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Valerie Rebecca Raedy
Represented By: Jean Marie Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?