Darge v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Suzanne M Darge
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv01201
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Kilolo Kijakazi (Pawlak, Brian)
September 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Tsui on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Judy Tsui (Tsui, Judy)
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 11/13/2023;Plaintiff's brief due 12/13/2023;Defendant's response due 1/12/2024;Plaintiff's reply due 1/30/2024. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 9/13/23. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge Brett H Ludwig no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Suzanne M Darge. (Chewning, Donald)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Suzanne M Darge. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 12, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Suzanne Darge ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4493524) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appeals Council denial, #3 ALJ decision)(Chewning, Donald) Modified on 9/11/2023 to correct entry (cmb).
September 11, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darge v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M Darge
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Judy Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?