Peterburs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jessica Lynn Peterburs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2023cv01212
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 11/20/2023;Plaintiff's brief due 12/20/2023;Defendant's response due 1/19/2024;Plaintiff's reply due 2/2/2024. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 19, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jessica Lynn Peterburs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Osterhout, Karl)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/18/2023 GRANTING #6 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jessica Lynn Peterburs. MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 9/18/2023 (asc).
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 DISREGARD; SEE #6 MOTION MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jessica Lynn Peterburs. (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 9/18/2023 (asc).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/13/2023. The plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee in this case. Dkt. No. 2. The request is incomplete--it is missing page 3. The court DIRECTS the plaintiff to re-file a complete request to proceed without prepaying the filing fee by the end of the day on September 22, 2023. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jessica Lynn Peterburs. (Osterhout, Karl)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jessica Lynn Peterburs. (Osterhout, Karl)
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Jessica Lynn Peterburs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osterhout, Karl)
September 12, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterburs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lynn Peterburs
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?