Renbarger v. Steiner et al
Plaintiff: Philip Renbarger
Defendant: Mitchell Steiner, Mario Eisenberger, Harry Fisch, Grace Hyun, Lucy Lu, Michael L Rankowitz, Michele Greco and Veru Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01291
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #23 Notice of Appearance filed by Philip Renbarger; This document and appearance should have been filed in case number 23-cv-1164 due to the cases being consolidated. See #22 Order for further details. This document and appearance needs to be re-filed in case number 23-cv-1164; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
November 21, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Egleston on behalf of Philip Renbarger. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory M. Egleston (Egleston, Gregory)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 11/8/2023 GRANTING #21 Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel - ALL further docketing should be in 23-cv-1164. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
November 7, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Consolidating Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel)(Malinowski, Austin)
October 23, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of Philip Renbarger. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)
October 19, 2023 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Philip Renbarger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Malinowski, Austin)
October 9, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Grace Hyun - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harry Fisch - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lucy Lu - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mario Eisenberger - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael L Rankowitz - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michele Greco - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mitchell Steiner - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
October 9, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Veru Inc - Waiver sent on 10/9/2023. (Egleston, Gregory)
September 28, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Philip Renbarger (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE by All Plaintiffs of Interest (Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Philip Renbarger. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4506611)(Malinowski, Austin)
September 28, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renbarger v. Steiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Renbarger
Represented By: Austin Malinowski
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Gregory M Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Eisenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Hyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Rankowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veru Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?