Schillinger v. Yang
Plaintiff: Daniel A Schillinger
Defendant: Kwon C Yang
Case Number: 2:2023cv01350
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kwon C Yang. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Toulouse, Pauline)
December 4, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (kah)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Kwon C Yang (Toulouse, Pauline)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Pauline Toulouse on behalf of Kwon C Yang. Attorney(s) appearing: Pauline Toulouse (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Toulouse, Pauline)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 11/13/23 that Schillinger's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. Schillinger's motion to appoint counsel #4 is DENIED without prejudice. Yang shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint within sixty days of receiving electronic notice of this order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to warden & pro se party)(jad)
October 27, 2023 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $1.00, Receipt Number: MK 93817 ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (lmf)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Daniel A Schillinger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
October 23, 2023 (PARTIAL) INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $11.19, Receipt Number: MK 93774; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (kwb)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 30 days from date of order plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 11.90 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 10/12/23. (cc: all counsel and mailed to warden & pro se party)(jad)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. (kah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel A Schillinger. (kah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel A Schillinger. (kah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Daniel A Schillinger. (kah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Kwon C Yang by Daniel A Schillinger. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Cover Letter)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schillinger v. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A Schillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwon C Yang
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Pauline Toulouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?