The Goat LLC et al v. Advanced Wholesale LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Goat LLC, Daniel Webster and Gary Graves
Defendant: Advanced Wholesale LLC and Nicholas Newgard
Case Number: 2:2023cv01526
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gross, Karl)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Gross, Karl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (rcm)
December 7, 2023 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (rcm)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/15/2023. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (ats) (rcm). Modified on 11/15/2023 (rcm).
November 15, 2023 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The disclosure statement should be filed as a separate document and not as an attachment to the initiating document. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
November 15, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
November 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Gross on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: J. Karl Gross (Gross, Karl)
November 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Plaintiffs by The Goat LLC, Gary Graves, Daniel Webster. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4541028) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - Civil, #4 Information Sheet Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Gross, Karl)
November 14, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Goat LLC et al v. Advanced Wholesale LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Goat LLC
Represented By: Karl Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Webster
Represented By: Karl Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Graves
Represented By: Karl Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Wholesale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Newgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?