King v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Kyle James King
Defendant: Steven Johnson, Sgt Furgason, Department of Corrections, C Riggs, BOCM, Capt Zartner and Health Service
Case Number: 2:2024cv00284
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/23/2024. #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee GRANTED; agency having custody of plaintiff to collect $346.56 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account under 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Amended complaint fails to state claim. Plaintiff may file second amended complaint by end of day 5/24/2024; failure to file by deadline will result in dismissal for failure to state claim, plaintiff will be issued "strike." (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Kyle King at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility-with amended complaint form and "Answers to Prisoner Litigants' Common Questions")(cb)
April 10, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kyle James King. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(amb)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff re: initial partial filing fee and request for federal court rules. (amb)
March 25, 2024 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $3.44, Receipt Number: MK 95102 ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ams)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kyle James King. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/6/2024. On or before 3/27/2024 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $3.44 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Kyle King at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(cb)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Kyle James King re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mew)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kyle James King. (mew)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kyle James King. (mew)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Department of Corrections, Sgt Furgason, Steven Johnson by Kyle James King. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle James King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Johnson
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Furgason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOCM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Zartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?