Boland v. LaVoie et al
Plaintiff: Clifford James Boland
Defendant: Daniel LaVoie and Jamie Barker
Case Number: 2:2024cv00352
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Clifford James Boland. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(amb)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/13/2024. #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee GRANTED; agency having custody of plaintiff to collect $315.21 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account under 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Defendants to file responsive pleading to complaint within 60 days. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Clifford Boland at Stanley Correctional Facility-with copy of "Answers to Prisoner Litigants' Common Questions")(cb)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Plaintiff enclosing payment. (edr)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $34.79, Receipt Number: MK 95342. The payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (mew)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/4/2024 re #7 plaintiff's letter request for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee. On March 25, 2024, the court ordered the plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee of $34.79 by April 15, 2024. Dkt. No. 5. On April 2, 2024, the court received from the plaintiff a letter, dated March 29, 2024, asking for an additional fourteen days to pay the fee. Dkt. No. 7. The plaintiff gives no reason why he needs the additional time and his due date is still nearly two weeks away. Nonetheless, the court GRANTS the plaintiff's request and ORDERS that the time for him to pay the $34.79 initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 29, 2024. The court will not again extend this deadline unless the plaintiff shows good cause warranting another extension. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Clifford Boland at Stanely Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Clifford James Boland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Clifford James Boland. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/25/2024. On or before 4/15/2024 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $34.79 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Clifford Boland at Stanley Correctional Institution)(cb)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Clifford James Boland re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mew)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Clifford James Boland. (mew)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Clifford James Boland. (mew)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Jamie Barker and Daniel LaVoie by Clifford James Boland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boland v. LaVoie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford James Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel LaVoie
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?