Woodland v. Meisner
Petitioner: Corey Woodland
Respondent: Warden Michael Meisner
Case Number: 2:2024cv00482
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE - ANSWER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Meisner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Judgment of Conviction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Briefs on Direct Appeal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wisconsin Court of Appeals Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 - Petition for Review, Response, and Order Denying Review, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jury Trial Transcript, April 5, 2021 (AM), #6 Exhibit 6 - Jury Trial Transcript, April 5, 2021 (PM), #7 Exhibit 7 - Jury Trial Transcript, April 6, 2021 (AM), #8 Exhibit 8 - Jury Trial Transcript, April 6, 2021 (PM), #9 Exhibit 9 - Jury Trial Transcript, April 7, 2021 (AM), #10 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot) Modified on 5/15/2024 (ams).
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliot M Held on behalf of Michael Meisner. Attorney(s) appearing: Eliot M. Held (Held, Eliot)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Corey Woodland. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Michael Meisner (Vandermeuse, Jennifer)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 4/24/24 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Within 60 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall either answer the petition, complying with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases, or file a dispositive motion. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/25/2024) (jad).
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. (kah)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Corey Woodland. (kah)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Corey Woodland. (kah)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Corey Woodland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Petition, #2 Envelope)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodland v. Meisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Woodland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Michael Meisner
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?