Matos et al v. Nantomah et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Matos and Jeannie Berry-Matos
Defendant: Joseph Nantomah, Onyeka Nantomah and Investors Capital LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00544
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2024 09:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 7/3/2024. The parties shall call the court Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 and use meeting ID 161 4125 0515 and passcode 414014 to join the call. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/4/2024. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Goodhart, Kate)
June 4, 2024 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to All Plaintiffs requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen Dries be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. (mew)
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Bertolotto, Piermario)
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bertolotto, Piermario)
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Bertolotto, Piermario)
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Piermario Bertolotto on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Piermario Bertolotto (Bertolotto, Piermario)
May 9, 2024 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Admission of Service filed by Jeannie Berry-Matos, Tomas Matos. All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mew)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Joseph Nantomah, Onyeka Nantomah, and Investors Capital LLC on May 8, 2024 by Attorney Piermario Bertolotto (Goodhart, Kate) Modified on 5/9/2024 (mew).
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/3/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
May 3, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Stephen Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (mew)
May 3, 2024 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint. The disclosure statement should not have been filed as an attachment; it should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mew)
May 3, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mew)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Tomas Matos, Jeannie Berry-Matos. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number BWIEDC-4669074) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Investment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint - Second Investment Agreement, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement)(Goodhart, Kate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matos et al v. Nantomah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Matos
Represented By: Kate M Goodhart
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Berry-Matos
Represented By: Kate M Goodhart
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nantomah
Represented By: Piermario Bertolotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyeka Nantomah
Represented By: Piermario Bertolotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Capital LLC
Represented By: Piermario Bertolotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?