Strong v. Dillett
Plaintiff: Josiah J Strong
Defendant: St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School and Elizabeth Dillett
Case Number: 2:2024cv00823
Filed: July 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Waldeck, Theodore)
August 19, 2024 Defendant Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc dba LUMIN Schools St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran terminated and dismissed with prejudice, on the merits and without costs and disbursements to any party pursuant to #18 Stipulation for Dismissal (vkb) Modified on 8/28/2024 (correcting parties - only defendant Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc is dismissed) (vkb)
August 16, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative, Inc. d/b/a LUMIN Schools St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School. (Waldeck, Theodore)
August 15, 2024 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Elizabeth Dillett (vkb)
August 14, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School - Waiver sent on 8/14/2024. (LaMarr, B'Ivory) Modified on 8/15/2024 (vkb)
August 14, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs upon pro se Defendant Elizabeth Dillett (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
August 14, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Elizabeth Dillett by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Service)(LaMarr, B'Ivory)
August 14, 2024 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
August 1, 2024 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Declaration: The attached declarations to this document should have been filed as separate entries. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (ams)
July 31, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School upon Pro se Defendant Elizabeth Dillett (Waldeck, Theodore)
July 31, 2024 Filing 12 UNPUBLISHED Decision (s) in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School (Waldeck, Theodore) Modified docket text on 8/1/2024 (ams).
July 31, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School. (Waldeck, Theodore)
July 31, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Theodore J. Waldeck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Lewis Polzin, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Susanne Rettg, #3 Exhibit C Picture of Envelope, #4 Exhibit D Pictures of Exterior Door)(Waldeck, Theodore)
July 31, 2024 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Waldeck, Theodore)
July 31, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc, St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School. (Waldeck, Theodore)
July 15, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josiah J Strong. St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School served on 7/10/2024. (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 15, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josiah J Strong. Lutheran Urban Mission Initiative Inc served on 7/10/2024. (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Elizabeth Dillett served on 7/10/2024. (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 8, 2024 Summons Issued as to St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School (vkb)
July 5, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 5, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 5, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Josiah J Strong. (Attachments: #1 Summons St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School)(LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Elizabeth Dillett, LUTHERAN URBAN MISSION INITIATIVE, INC. by Josiah J Strong. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4712695) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons LUMIN Summons, #3 Summons Dillett Summons)(LaMarr, B'Ivory)
July 2, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ams)
July 2, 2024 Summons Issued as to Defendants (vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Dillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah J Strong
Represented By: B'Ivory LaMarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Peter-Immanuel Lutheran Church and School
Represented By: Theodore J Waldeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?