Ozier v. Derks et al
Plaintiff: Leatha Ozier
Defendant: David Derks, Jacalyn Labre and Racine County
Case Number: 2:2024cv01030
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leatha Ozier. David Derks served on 10/10/2024. (ams)
October 7, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by David Derks re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pomplin, Ian)
September 23, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leatha Ozier. (ams)
September 23, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Young in Support of #12 BRIEF. (ams)
September 23, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Leatha Ozier in Support of #12 BRIEF. (ams)
September 23, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Leatha Ozier re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Statute of Limitations and Joinder in Motion of Defendant Derks. (ams)
September 5, 2024 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by Jacalyn LaBre re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Statute of Limitations and Joinder in Motion of Defendant Derks . (Peters, Daniel)
September 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Statute of Limitations and Joinder in Motion of Defendant Derks by Jacalyn LaBre. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peters, Daniel)
September 4, 2024 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by David Derks re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Derks in Support, #2 Ex. 1 - Search Warrant)(Pomplin, Ian)
September 4, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by David Derks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Rule 56 Disclosures)(Pomplin, Ian)
September 4, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Derks. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pomplin, Ian)
September 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian R Pomplin on behalf of David Derks. Attorney(s) appearing: Ian R. Pomplin (Pomplin, Ian)
August 28, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jacalyn LaBre. Waiver mailed - 8/15/2024. (Peters, Daniel) Modified docket text on 8/29/2024 (ams).
August 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B Peters on behalf of Jacalyn Labre. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel B. Peters (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peters, Daniel)
August 15, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leatha Ozier. David Derks served on 8/15/2024; Jacalyn Labre served on 8/15/2024. (ams)
August 15, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Leatha Ozier. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ams)
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against David Derks, Jacalyn Labre, Racine County filed by Leatha Ozier. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (Filing Fee PAID $405.00; Rct No. MK 96317) (Service Packet Issued)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozier v. Derks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Derks
Represented By: Ian R Pomplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacalyn Labre
Represented By: Daniel B Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatha Ozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?