White et al v. Whitefish Bay School Board et al
Plaintiff: K. K. and Shaneeka White
Defendant: Julie Henningsen, John Thomsen, Amy Levek and Whitefish Bay School Board
Case Number: 2:2024cv01076
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (edr)
October 16, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Thome, Matthew)
October 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Thome on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Thome (Thome, Matthew)
October 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Malia T Malone on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Malia T. Malone (Malone, Malia)
October 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin Mathers on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Kirstin R. Mathers (Mathers, Kirstin)
September 20, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. (Lambert, Elisabeth)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/30/2024 granting #3 Motion to Seal Document re #1 Complaint; granting #3 Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel)(EAB)
August 29, 2024 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lambert, Elisabeth)
August 28, 2024 NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiffs requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (edr)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/27/2024. Judge J P Stadtmueller recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Restrict Document Complaint Exhibits B, D, E, F, G and MOTION for a Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Lambert, Elisabeth). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 8/26/2024 (mew).
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Lambert, Elisabeth)
August 26, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ams)
August 26, 2024 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint Exhibits B, D, E, F, and G filed by K.K. and Shaneeka White. Pursuant to General Local Rule 79, the Court will consider all documents to be filed publicly unless a separate motion to seal or restrict is filed. You should file your motion to seal or restrict documents immediately. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mew)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by K. K., Shaneeka White. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4754474) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A - Bullying Policy, #3 Ex. B - Nov 15 Lemke Decision, #4 Ex. C. - Discrimination Complaint Procedures, #5 Ex D. Dec 13 Henningsen Decision, #6 Ex. E. Dec 15 Thomsen Decision, #7 Ex. F - Jan 12 Thomsen Decision, #8 Ex. G - Ltr Re Appeal Procedure, #9 Ex. H - Appeal 1 Decision, #10 Ex. I - Appeal 2 Decision)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Lambert, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Whitefish Bay School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. K.
Represented By: Elisabeth Winston Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneeka White
Represented By: Elisabeth Winston Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Henningsen
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Represented By: Malia T Malone
Represented By: Kirstin Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomsen
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Represented By: Malia T Malone
Represented By: Kirstin Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Levek
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Represented By: Malia T Malone
Represented By: Kirstin Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitefish Bay School Board
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Represented By: Malia T Malone
Represented By: Kirstin Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?