Raby v. Mecum Auction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Raby
Defendant: John Smith and Mecum Auction Inc
Case Number: 2:2024cv01548
Filed: December 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family & Medical Leave Act 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Smith - Waiver sent on 1/7/2025. (Dartt, Connor)
January 7, 2025 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mecum Auction Inc - Waiver sent on 1/7/2025. (Dartt, Connor)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Melissa Raby. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dartt, Connor)
December 3, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
December 3, 2024 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been added - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Addresses and punctuation removed from party names - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The disclosure statement should be filed as a separate document and not as an attachment to the initiating document. This document does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Melissa Raby. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4829260) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Unissued Summons_Mecum, #3 Summons Unissued Summons_Smith, #4 Disclosure Statement)(Dartt, Connor)
December 2, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raby v. Mecum Auction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Raby
Represented By: Connor J Dartt
Represented By: Ohioma Emil Ovbiagele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mecum Auction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?