Hippe v. Radio Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Xinyue Hippe
Defendant: Radio Systems Corporation
Case Number: 2:2025cv00270
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132 ADA - Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Case Terminated (jcl)
April 16, 2025 Docket Annotation: The parties have advised the court that this case has settled. Therefore, this case will be closed for administrative purposes only pending receipt of a stipulation of dismissal. (amh)
April 15, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Radio Systems Corporation by Xinyue Hippe. (Reyes, David)
March 19, 2025 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Xinyue Hippe. (Reyes, David)
March 19, 2025 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (edr)
March 18, 2025 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Xinyue Hippe. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Reyes, David)
March 4, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xinyue Hippe. Radio Systems Corporation served on 3/3/2025. (Reyes, David)
February 25, 2025 Summons Issued as to Radio Systems Corporation. (edr)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Radio Systems Corporation by Xinyue Hippe. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4890512) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reyes, David)
February 24, 2025 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hippe v. Radio Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinyue Hippe
Represented By: David Baldemar Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?