SUOJA, DELORES AGNES v. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Case Number: 3:1999cv00475
Filed: August 5, 1999
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION AND ORDER entering Judgment in favor of defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/16. (jat)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION and ORDER denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 112 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/9/15. (jat)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting as unopposed 27 Motion to Bar the "Any Exposure" Causation Opinion; granting as unopposed 32 Motion to Bar the Longo/MAS Videotaped Experiments and Related Testimony; granting 40 Motion to Exclude Barry Castleman, Sc.D. with respect to testimony related to medical literature and denying with respect to testimony related to other historical documents discussed in Castleman's expert report. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/14/15. (jat)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER vacating Order 61 . Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/18/15. (jat)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting as unopposed 32 Motion to Bar the Longo/MAS Videotaped Experiments and Related Testimony , 40 Motion to Exclude Barry Castleman, Sc.D. and 27 Motion to Bar the "Any Exposure" Causation Opinion by Defendant Owens-Illinois Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/13/2015. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUOJA, DELORES AGNES v. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?