HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. GOOGLE INC. Featured Case

Plaintiffs HyperPhrase Technologies LLC and HyperPhrase Inc. alleged that Defendant Google Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,434,567 entitled "Method for Specifying Enterprise-wide Database Address Formats," No. 6,507,837 entitled "Tiered and Content Based Database Searching," No. 6,516,321 entitled "Method for Database Address Specification," and No. 5,903,889 entitled "System and Method for Translating, Collecting and Archiving Patient Records for Automated Data Storage and Retrieval."

Plaintiff: HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and HYPERPHRASE INC.
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Case Number: 3:2006cv00199
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: John C Shabaz
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's motion to compel, dkt. 156 , is denied as moot given plaintiff's circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/15/09. (rep)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Raymond P. Niro, Jennifer L Amundsen, and Kim Grimmer terminated Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/5/09. (rep)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER on 158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Deft. given the opportunity to respond by 9/28/2009. If needed, plaintiff's Brief in Reply due by 10/5/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/24/09. (rep)
September 22, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Attorney Niro responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. (llj)
September 22, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Ex Parte Telephone Motion Hearing re 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. 10 (Court Reporter cs.) skv)
September 21, 2009 Filing 160 Objection to Motion by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2009-07-14 Ltr to Niro fr Wolff re enforcing judgment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Contact Info for Park Towne) (Wolff, Jason)
September 21, 2009 Reset Deadlines as to 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs. Ex Parte Motion Hearing reset for 9/22/2009 at 11:00 AM before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. (rep)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** An ex parte telephone hearing will be held on 158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney on September 22, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. CDST. Mr. Niro is responsible for initiating the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. A representative of plaintiffs should be on the telephone. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/21/09. (rep)
September 18, 2009 Filing 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.Response due by 9/25/2009. (Amundsen, Jennifer)
September 16, 2009 Filing 157 BRIEF in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 156 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2009-07-28 Google 3rd Set of Interrog. Nos 10-16, # 2 Exhibit B - 2009-07-28 Google 2nd Set of RFP No 81, # 3 Exhibit C - 2009-09-02 Ltr to Niro fr Wolff re responses to addl discovery, # 4 Exhibit D - US v Thurner ED Wis 2007, # 5 Exhibit E - Rubin v Iran ND Ill 2008) (Wolff, Jason)
September 16, 2009 Set Briefing Deadlines as to 156 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. Brief in Opposition due by 9/30/2009. Brief in Reply due by 10/7/2009. (rep)
September 15, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker.Response due by 9/22/2009. (Attachments: # 1 MPA ISO Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, # 2 Exhibit A - 2009-07-28 Google 3rd Set of Rogs Nos 10-16, 5 pp., # 3 Exhibit B - 2009-07-28 Google 2nd Set of RFP No 81, 5 pp., # 4 Exhibit C - 2009-09-02 Ltr to Niro fr Wolff re responses to addl discovery, 4 pp., # 5 Exhibit D - US v Thurner ED Wis 2007, 3 pp., # 6 Exhibit E - Rubin v Iran ND Ill 2008, 19 pp., # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolff, Jason) Emailed attorney to file the brief in support separately, 9/16/2009 (jef).
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying 150 Motion for a finding that this case is exceptional and warrants an award of attorney fees. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/12/09. (rep) Modified text on 9/17/2009 (llj/t).
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER from Federal Circuit dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute in accordance with the rules as to 144 149 Notice of Appeal filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. No record to be returned. (elc)
February 23, 2009 Filing 153 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Google's Motion to Find This Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Award Post-Remand Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by GOOGLE INC. (Wolff, Jason)
February 18, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-1186 for 149 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (arw)
February 18, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-1185 for 144 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (arw)
February 13, 2009 Filing 152 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Google's Motion to Find This Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Award Post-Remand Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Niro, Raymond)
January 26, 2009 Set Briefing Deadlines re: 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees Google's Motion to Find This Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Award Post-Remand Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Brief in Opposition due 2/13/2009, Brief in Reply due 2/23/2009. (arw)
January 23, 2009 Filing 151 BRIEF in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Google's Motion to Find This Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Award Post-Remand Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Hyperphrase's Reply Brief) (Peterson, James)
January 23, 2009 Filing 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Google's Motion to Find This Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Award Post-Remand Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Peterson, James)
January 16, 2009 Short record sent to Federal Circuit re: 149 . (mmo)
January 16, 2009 Short record sent to Federal Circuit re: 144 (mmo)
January 16, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 148 JUDGMENT, 141 ORDER on Motion for Summary Judgment. (Niro, Raymond)
January 9, 2009 Filing 148 AMENDED JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiffs Hyperphrase Technologies, LLC and Hyperphrase, Inc.'s claims with prejudice, and dismissing defendant Google, Inc.'s claims, defenses and counterclaims without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Peter Oppeneer on 1/9/2009. (PAO) (arw)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 146 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 1/7/2009. (arw)
January 6, 2009 Filing 146 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims. (Peterson, James)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER on Bill of Costs: Costs taxed in favor of Defendant in the amount of $36,491.10. Signed by Clerk of Court Peter A Oppeneer on 12/5/2008. (arw)
October 23, 2008 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appeal to Federal Circuit by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Niro, Raymond) Modified on 1/16/2009. (mmo).
October 15, 2008 Filing 143 Bill of Costs by Defendant GOOGLE INC. Motions referred to Joel W Turner, Acting Clerk. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 10/27/2008. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due by 11/6/2008. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due by 11/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Bill of Costs) (Wolff, Jason)
October 1, 2008 Filing 142 JUDGMENT in favor of GOOGLE INC. against HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC dismissing complaint with prejudice. ( JWT) (llj)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant GOOGLE, INC. Plaintiffs Hyperphrase Technologies, LLC and Hyperphrase, Inc.'s complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 9/30/2008. (arw)
June 11, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen L Crocker : Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2008 [:06] (cak)
June 11, 2008 Set/Reset Trial Deadlines: Jury Selection and Trial reset for 3/23/2009 at 9:00 AM. (arw)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Jury selection and trial rescheduled from March 16, 2009 to March 23, 2009 at 9:00 AM. All other dates remain as previously scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 6/11/2008. (arw)
June 9, 2008 Set Status Conference: Telephonic Status conference set for 6/11/08 at 10:00 AM. PLAINTIFF responsible for setting up the call. (mfh)
May 19, 2008 Filing 139 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Regarding Invalidity (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, '321 Patent and Gennaro Patent) (Wolff, Jason)
May 19, 2008 Filing 138 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Regarding HyperPhrase PFOF, Docket No. 132 (Wolff, Jason)
May 19, 2008 Filing 137 Reply to Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Wolff, Jason)
May 19, 2008 Filing 136 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Regarding Noninfringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Summary of Claim Construction and Infringement Theories # 2 Exhibit 2, Terminology Used By the Parties to Refer to AutoLink) (Wolff, Jason)
May 19, 2008 Filing 135 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Regarding No Willfulness (Wolff, Jason)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Granting 133 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule re: motion for summary judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Brief in Reply due by 5/19/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 4/17/08. (krj)
April 15, 2008 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule by Defendant GOOGLE INC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker. Response due by 4/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Correspondence from counsel stating agreement with proposed amended briefing schedule) (Wolff, Jason) Modified docket text on 4/16/2008 (Wiseman, Andrew).
April 11, 2008 Filing 132 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Niro, Raymond)
April 11, 2008 Filing 131 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Niro, Raymond)
April 11, 2008 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Carlos de la Huerga filed by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Niro, Raymond)
April 11, 2008 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Thompson filed by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Niro, Raymond)
April 11, 2008 Filing 128 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity re: '889 and '321 patents filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Niro, Raymond) Modified docket text on 4/14/2008 (Jacobson, Kris).
April 11, 2008 Filing 127 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '889 and '321 patents filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Niro, Raymond) Modified docket text on 4/14/2008 (Jacobson, Kris).
April 11, 2008 Filing 126 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willfulness re: '889 and '321 patents filed by GOOGLE INC. (Niro, Raymond) Modified docket text on 4/14/2008 (Jacobson, Kris).
April 11, 2008 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Raymond P. Niro filed by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Counter Defendants HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC Response re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R) (Niro, Raymond)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Granting 122 MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Motion for a New Schedule for Summary Judgment on Google's License Defense filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. Discovery concerning Google's license defense shall begin the day after the court issues its summary judgment decision on invalidity and non-infringement and shall end four weeks later. Not later than three weeks after the close of licensing discovery, Hyperphrase shall file its response to Google's motion for summary judgment on the defense of licensing. Google shall file any reply not later than TWO weeks after Hyperphrase files its response. The parties shall not change this schedule without leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 4/8/08. (krj)
April 7, 2008 Filing 123 BRIEF in Opposition by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 122 MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Motion for a New Schedule for Summary Judgment on Google's License Defense filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. (Wolff, Jason)
April 1, 2008 Filing 122 MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Motion for a New Schedule for Summary Judgment on Google's License Defense by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker.Response due by 4/8/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Niro, Raymond)
March 28, 2008 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah L. Renfro for Defendant GOOGLE INC. (Renfro, Hannah)
March 26, 2008 Filing 120 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Defendant GOOGLE INC., Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Wolff, Jason)
March 26, 2008 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason William Wolff for Defendant GOOGLE INC. (Wolff, Jason)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Amend counterclaims. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 3/25/08. (elc)
March 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief in Opposition to s/j due by 4/11/2008, Brief in Reply to s/j due by 4/21/2008. (llj)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Motions in Limine due by 2/20/2009, Response to Motions due by 2/27/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2009 at 4:00 PM. Final Pretrial Submissions due 2/26/2009. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/16/2009 at 9:00 AM. Activity by 1/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 3/21/2008. (arw)
March 20, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen L Crocker : Telephone Status Conference held on 3/20/2008 [:30] (cak)
March 18, 2008 Filing 116 Set/Reset Pretrial or Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/20/2008 at 08:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff responsible for setting up the call. (cak)
March 11, 2008 Filing 115 Exhibit to 114 Brief in Reply, filed by GOOGLE INC. Exhibit 10 (Sealed Document). (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2008 Filing 114 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Answer and Counterclaims and Memorandum in Support filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents and Exhibits 6-9 [Exhibit 10 filed under seal]) (Peterson, James)
March 11, 2008 Filing 113 Set Pretrial or Status Conference: Counsel for Plaintiffs responsible for setting up the call.Status Conference set for 3/19/2008 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Crocker. (llj)
March 10, 2008 This case has been reassigned to Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb. The following hearing(s) have been rescheduled before Judge Crabb: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2008 at 01:15 PM,Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/12/2008 at 09:00 AM. (llj)
March 7, 2008 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Amundsen for Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Amundsen, Jennifer)
March 6, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Answer and Counterclaims and Memorandum in Support. Brief in Opposition due by 3/11/2008. (mmo)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Accepting 99 STIPULATION for Protective Order. The court ACCEPTS and ENTERS the stipulated protective order in this case EXCEPT THAT the definitions of "Confidential Information" and "Confidential-- Source Code" are modified to make them objective, not subjective, by deleting the phrase "such party in good faith believes [that]" from Paragraphs (1) and (2) of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 3/4/08. (mmo)
March 4, 2008 Filing 110 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re: 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Answer and Counterclaims and Memorandum in Support filed by GOOGLE INC. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (sealed)# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order) (Amundsen, Jennifer)
February 29, 2008 Filing 109 JUDGMENT from Federal Circuit; affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded as to 78 Notice of Appeal, 66 Notice of Appeal. ( (mmo)
February 29, 2008 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re 104 Brief in Support, 106 Affidavit, 107 Exhibit, 105 Affidavit, 102 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, 101 Brief in Support, 103 Brief in Support, 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 107 Exhibit to 106 Affidavit, filed by GOOGLE INC., 99 Stipulation filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC., GOOGLE INC., 100 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Exhibit I to the Declaration of Jason W. Wolff Dk#106 (Sealed Document). (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Jason W. Wolff filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents; Part 1 Exhibits A - C# 2 Exhibit Part 2, Exhibits D and E# 3 Exhibit Part 3, Exhibit F-G# 4 Exhibit Part 4, Exhibits H-N) (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 105 Second AFFIDAVIT of W. Bruce Croft, PH.D. filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents for Exhibits Attached to the Second Declaration of W. Bruce Croft, PH.D. and Exhibits) (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 104 BRIEF in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Memorandum In Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 5,903,899 and 6,516,321 (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 103 BRIEF in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Memorandum In Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,903,889 and 6,516,321 (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 102 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 101 BRIEF in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GOOGLE INC. Of No Willfulness Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 5,903,889 and 6,516,321 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Lucent Techs, Inc. v. Gateway, Inc.# 2 Exhibit B - Franklin Elec. Co., Inc. v. Dover Corp.) (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant GOOGLE INC. Brief in Opposition due by 3/20/2008, Brief in Reply due by 3/31/2008. (Peterson, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 99 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Peterson, James)
February 27, 2008 Filing 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Counterclaims and Memorandum in Support by Defendant GOOGLE INC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 - Google Inc.'s First Amended Answer and Counterclaims # 5 Exhibit 5 - Redline showing substantive changes) (Peterson, James)
February 12, 2008 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by James Donald Peterson for Defendant GOOGLE INC. (Peterson, James)
February 8, 2008 Filing 96 NOTICE by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: status of Mandate from the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. Petition for rehearing denied 2/7/08; mandate to issue within 7 days thereafter. (Friedman, James) Modified docket text on 2/12/2008 (Jensen, Lori).
January 23, 2008 Set/Reset Trial Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2008, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2008 01:15 PM, Final Pretrial Submissions due 4/7/2008, Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/12/2008 at 09:00 AM. (llj)
January 23, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2008. (llj)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Reschedule. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2008 at 01:15 PM. Final Pretrial Submissions due 4/7/2008 Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/12/2008 at 09:00 AM. Activity by 3/13/2008 Signed by Judge John C Shabaz on 1/23/2008. (llj)
January 23, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John C Shabaz : Telephone Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2008 re 91 MOTION to Reschedule FPTC and TRIAL DATES filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. [:09] (mfh)
January 22, 2008 Filing 94 BRIEF in Reply in Support re: 91 MOTION to Reschedule FPTC and TRIAL DATES filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. (Grimmer, Kim)
January 11, 2008 Filing 93 BRIEF in Opposition by Defendant GOOGLE INC. re: 91 MOTION to Reschedule FPTC and TRIAL DATES filed by HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, HYPERPHRASE INC. (llj)
January 4, 2008 Filing 92 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to 91 MOTION to Reschedule FPTC and TRIAL DATES. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2008 at 08:45 AM. Counsel for Plaintiffs responsible for setting up the call. (llj)
January 3, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION to Reschedule FPTC and TRIAL DATES, by Plaintiffs HYPERPHRASE INC., HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (llj)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER AFFIRMING TAXATION OF COSTS IN AMT. OF $35,011.02; STAYING ENFORCEMENT W/O BOND UNTIL 30 DAYS FROM APPEAL MANDATE.
April 9, 2007 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM W. FLACHSBART.
April 9, 2007 Filing 88 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS. MOTION FOR COURT REVIEW OF TAXABLE COSTS OR TO POSTPONE PROCEEDINGS ON BILL OF COSTS
April 3, 2007 Filing 87 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY DEFT. TO PLTFS. MOTION FOR COURT REVIEW OF TAXABLE COSTS.
March 26, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION BY PLTFS. FOR COURT REVIEW OF TAXABLE COSTS OR TO POSTPONE PROCEEDINGS ON BILL OF COSTS PENDING APPELLATE REVIEW.
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER TAXING COSTS IN FAVOR OF DEFT. IN AMOUNT OF $35,011.02. (TMO) CC MLD
February 26, 2007 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM W. FLACHSBART.
February 26, 2007 Filing 83 BRIEF IN REPLY IN OPPO. TO BILL OF COSTS BY PLTFS.
February 26, 2007 *APPEAL FEE PAID* CC:FED. CIR.
February 20, 2007 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT (2ND) OF VALERIE J. ANDERSON.
February 20, 2007 Filing 81 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. BILL OF COSTS.
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING DEFT. MOTION TO FIND CASE EXCEPTIONAL AND AWARD FEES PURSUANT TO 35 USC 285.
February 9, 2007 Filing 79 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO BILL OF COSTS BY PLTF.
February 8, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEAL *FEDERAL CIR.* BY PLTFS. NO FEE PAID, SR SENT CC:PARTIES (07-1176)
February 2, 2007 Filing 77 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION TO FIND CASE EXCEPTIONAL AND TO AWARD ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES.
January 29, 2007 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT OF VALERIE J. ANDERSON.
January 29, 2007 Filing 75 BILL OF COSTS BY DEFT.
January 29, 2007 Filing 74 NOTICE OF FILING BILL OF COSTS AND REQ. TO TAX COSTS BY DEFT.
January 24, 2007 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT GREENSPOON. (SEALED)
January 24, 2007 Filing 72 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTF. TO DEFT. MOTION TO FIND CASE EXCEPTIONAL AND TO AWARD ATTY. FEES AND EXPENSES. (SEALED)
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PATENT CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE.
January 4, 2007 Filing 70 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION TO FIND CASE EXCEPTIONAL AND TO AWARD ATTY. FEES AND EXPENSES.
January 4, 2007 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE C. LACAVERA.
January 4, 2007 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT OF JASON W. WOLFF.
January 4, 2007 Filing 67 MOTION BY DEFT. TO FIND CASE EXCEPTIONAL UNDER 35 USC 285 AND TO AWARD ATTY. FEES AND EXPENSES.
December 27, 2006 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL *FEDERAL CIR* BY PLTFS. FEE PAID, SR SENT CC:PARTIES (07-1125)
December 21, 2006 Filing 65 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFT. AGAINST PLTF. DISMISSING PLTF. COMPLAINT AND ALL CLAIMS W/PREJ. AND COSTS. (JCS/TMO) CC MLD
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J; DENYING AS MOOT ALL PENDING MOTIONS CONCERNING VALIDITY; ENTERING JUDGMENT.
December 20, 2006 Filing 63 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS. UNTIMELY DECLARATIONS AND EXPERT REPORTS.
December 8, 2006 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT (2ND) OF ROBERT GREENSPOON.
December 8, 2006 Filing 61 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTFS. TO DEFT. MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS. UNTIMELY DECLARATIONS AND EXPERT REPORTS.
December 1, 2006 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. KIRK.
December 1, 2006 Filing 59 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS. UNTIMELY DECLARATIONS AND EXPERT REPORTS.
December 1, 2006 Filing 58 MOTION BY DEFT. TO STRIKE PLTFS. UNTIMELY DECLARATIONS AND EXPERT REPORTS.
December 1, 2006 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT OF ANN C. CHAPLIN.
December 1, 2006 Filing 56 DEFT. REPLY TO PLTFS. RESPONSE TO PROPOSED S/J FINDINGS/CONCL. (SEALED)
December 1, 2006 Filing 55 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J RE: INVALIDITY UNDER 35 USC 102.
December 1, 2006 Filing 54 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J RE: INVALIDITY UNDER 35 USC 112.
December 1, 2006 Filing 53 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J RE: NONINFRINGEMENT BY AUTOLINK.
December 1, 2006 Filing 52 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J RE: NONINFRINGEMENT BY ADSENSE. (SEALED)
December 1, 2006 Filing 51 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS. MOTION FOR S/J RE: GOOGLE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE.
November 22, 2006 Filing 50 RESPONSE BY PLTFS. TO COUNT III OF DEFT. COUNTERCLAIMS.
November 21, 2006 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT OF MICHAEL J. KANE. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 48 RESPONSE TO PROPOSED S/J FINDINGS/CONCL. BY DEFT. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 47 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY DEFT. TO PLTFS. MOTION FOR S/J RE: GOOGLE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT OF CARLOS DE LA HUERGA. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERGEI NIRENBURG.
November 21, 2006 Filing 44 RESPONSE TO PROPOSED S/J FINDINGS/CONCL. BY PLTFS. AND STATEMENT OF PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FINDINGS/CONCLUSIONS.(SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 43 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTFS. TO DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 USC 112.
November 21, 2006 Filing 42 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTFS. TO DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF INVALIDITY BASED ON ANTICIPATION (35 USC 102)
November 21, 2006 Filing 41 DEPOSITION OF GREGORY BADROS, TAKEN 11/6/06. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 40 DEPOSITION OF GUEORGUI DJABAROV, TAKEN 11/15/06. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT AND SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF PAUL THOMPSON. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT GREENSPOON. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 37 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTFS. TO DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF AUTOLINK NONINFRINGEMENT. (SEALED)
November 21, 2006 Filing 36 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTFS. TO DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF ADSENSE NONINFRINGEMENT. (SEALED)
November 1, 2006 Filing 35 EXHIBITS Q-AA TO AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM R. WOODFORD.
November 1, 2006 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF W. BRUCE CROFT.
November 1, 2006 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF GUEORGUI DJABAROV.
November 1, 2006 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. KIRK.
November 1, 2006 Filing 31 EXHIBIT A TO AFFIDAVIT OF IAN S. GRAHAM.
November 1, 2006 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF IAN S. GRAHAM.
November 1, 2006 Filing 29 EXHIBIT P TO AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM R. WOODFORD.
November 1, 2006 Filing 28 EXHIBITS J-O TO AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM R. WOODFORD.
November 1, 2006 Filing 27 EXHIBITS F-I TO AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM R. WOODFORD.
November 1, 2006 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM R. WOODFORD IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF NONINFRINGEMENT AND VALIDITY W/EXHS. A-E.
November 1, 2006 Filing 25 PROPOSED FINDINGS/CONCL. BY PLTFS. IN SUPPORT OF S/J MOTION RE: GOOGLE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE.
November 1, 2006 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS. MOTION FOR S/J RE: GOOGLE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE.
November 1, 2006 Filing 23 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTFS. RE: GOOGLE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE.
November 1, 2006 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF GREGORY J. BADROS. (SEALED)
November 1, 2006 Filing 21 PROPOSED FINDINGS/CONCL. BY DEFT. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR S/J. (SEALED)
November 1, 2006 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF NONINFRINGEMENT BY ADSENSE. (SEALED)
November 1, 2006 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 USC 102.
November 1, 2006 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 USC 112.
November 1, 2006 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFT. MOTION FOR S/J RE: NONINFRINGEMENT BY AUTOLINK.
November 1, 2006 Filing 16 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFT. RE: NONINFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY.
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING PLTFS. MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT COUNTERCLAIM AND DEFENSE.
August 7, 2006 Filing 14 BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS. MOT. TO DMS AND/OR STRIKE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS
July 31, 2006 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY DEFT TO PLTFS MOT TO DMS AND/OR STRIKE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS
July 10, 2006 Filing 12 PLTFS. RESPONSE TO DEFT. COUNTERCLAIMS.
July 10, 2006 Filing 11 MOTION BY PLTFS. TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS W/BRIEF IN SUPPORT.
June 20, 2006 Filing 10 ANSWER
June 6, 2006 Filing 9 PTC ORDER
June 5, 2006 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY DEFT.
June 5, 2006 Filing 7 PPTC REPORT BY DEFT.
June 2, 2006 Filing 6 PPTC REPORT BY PLTFS.
May 31, 2006 Filing 5 COMPLAINT - AMENDED.
May 1, 2006 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY PLTFS.
April 27, 2006 Filing 3 SUMMONS
April 13, 2006 Filing 2 COMPLAINT
April 12, 2006 Filing 1 JS-44 - SUMMONS ISSUED.
April 12, 2006 NORTC - FEE PAID.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYPERPHRASE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYPERPHRASE INC.
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: FRANK E. SCHERKENBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?