Calhoun v. Schaldach et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Calhoun
Defendant: David Schaldach, Charles Amundson and John Cram
Case Number: 3:2008cv00194
Filed: April 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER directing clerk to issue writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum for the attendance of David Schaldach at trial beginning 10/12/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/5/09. (krj)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 33 Unopposed MOTION to Permit David Schaldach to Appear for Trial in Street Clothes and without Restraints filed by David Schaldach. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/5/09. (krj)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER instructing counsel to contact the court by telephone at 815-987-4480 if they wish to restart mediation. Signed by Philip G Reinhard on 9/23/09. (krj)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on telephonic conference. Mediation set for 6/5/09 at 12:30 p.m. in Madison. Settlement letters due 6/1/09. Signed by Philip G Reinhard on 5/20/09. (krj)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER scheduling telephonic conference for 5/20/09 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff to initiate call. Signed by Philip G Reinhard on 5/15/09. (krj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Schaldach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Calhoun
Represented By: Michael J. Devanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schaldach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Amundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?