Teed v. JT Packard & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Teed
Defendant: JT Packard & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00303
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 JUDGMENT in favor of Andy Ai, Brian Teed, Christopher Kraft, Curtis Troup, Darrick Nelson, Ethel McNamara, Eula Sheehan, Henry Chau, James Benson, James Provenzale, Jeff St. Onge, Jesse Olivas, Jimmy Rivera, Kevin Burk, Lewis Tate, Marcus Clay, Mic hael Anderson, Michael Kehrmeyer, Norman Eastwood, Jr., Oma Graves, Oumar Sow, Richard Silvers, Robert Dabal, Scott Wolf, Theresa Fritscher Rucho, Tim Hershey, Walt Gibson, Wesley Marcum, William Perry, Jr. against Thomas & Betts Power Solutions, L.L.C. in the amount of $ 338,488.22. (BBC / LK). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/20/2012. Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Thomas & Betts Power Solutions, L.L.C. in the amount of $ 162,500.00. (BBC / PAO/LK). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/22/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Approving Offer of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/18/2012. Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re (105 in 3:09-cv-00313-bbc, 157 in 3:08-cv-00303-bbc) Notice of acceptance of offer of judgment. Plaintiffs may have until 5/17/20 to respond to this order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/10/2012. Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that plaintiffs Robert Dabal, Lewis Tate, Eula Sheehan (as real party in interest for the Estate of Thomas Daly) and Ethel McNamara (as real party in interest for the Estate of Michael McNamara) may have until April 26, 2012, in which to adv ise the court in writing of their objection to the motion filed by counsel to withdraw as these plaintiffs legal representatives. Any such objection should be mailed to the Clerk of Court, Western District of Wisconsin, P.O. Box 432, Madison, WI 53701. If no objection is received by April 26, 2012, the motion will be granted in full. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/11/2012. Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re: 3/30/2012 Telephone Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/2/2012. Associated Cases: 3:08-cv-00303-bbc, 3:09-cv-00313-bbc (voc)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order re 88 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Brian Teed. Plaintiff may have until 9/22/2010 to file reply brief on motion to substitute a party. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/15/2010. (llj)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order: A telephone status conference was held in this case on August 6, 2010 before United States District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Plaintiffs Brian Teed and Marcus Clay appeared by Larry Johnson. There were no appearances for defendant, which is no l onger in business, having sold its assets. Before these cases can proceed, it will be necessary to determine whether the asset purchaser has any potential liability for wrongful acts committed by defendant. Mr. Johnson believes that it does and inte nds to serve the new entity in this case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) (substitution of transferee party for original). He may have until August 19, 2010, in which to accomplish service under that theory. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/9/2010. (vob)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 65 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 71 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/2/2010. (vob)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Counsel for defendants JT Packard and Associates, Inc., and S.R. Bray Corporation,have advised the court that J.T. Packard & Associates, Inc., has filed for receivership in state court. Defendants ask the court to either stay all proceedings in this case until the state court proceedings are complete or to dismiss the case without prejudice, allowing the parties claims to be resolved in state court. I am prepared to dismiss the proceedings without prejudice unless plaintiffs object to my doing so and have a persuasive reason why the case should not be dismissed. Plaintiffs may have until January 4, 2010 to object. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/17/09. (vob)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that plaintiff may proceed as a class representative on behalf of those individuals who opted-in to the FLSA class action by 12/6/2008. Plaintiff may proceed only on his own behalf on state law claim. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 3/9/09. (vob) Modified text on 3/18/2009 (llj).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teed v. JT Packard & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Teed
Represented By: Larry A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT Packard & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?