Redmond v. Landers et al
Plaintiff: Rodney James Redmond
Defendant: Landers, Janet Walsh, Martha Breen, Ryan Tobiasz and Mike Vandenbrook
Case Number: 3:2009cv00087
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER appointing Jeffrey A. Simmons to represent plaintiff in this case. Proceedings stayed pending a status conference to be held with the magistrate judge. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/09. (elc),(ps)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/20/09. (elc),(ps)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing petitioner to file a proposed amended complaint that complies with Rule 8 by 3/27/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 3/13/09. (elc),(ps)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 3.83 assessed.(Initial partial filing fee due by 3/16/2009.) (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Landers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney James Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landers
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Walsh
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Breen
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Tobiasz
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Vandenbrook
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?