Walls v. Holinka et al
Petitioner: Felix Walls
Respondent: Carol Holinka and Article II Sworn Official(s) of the Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2009cv00430
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/22/2009. (eds),(ps)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 16 MOTION for Issuance of Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Article 5 of the National Constitution, 17 MOTION to Transfer Redress of Grievance(s) Pursuant to Article 1 Sec. 8 and Statutory under 28 U.S.C. 3002(15)(A), 19 MOTION to Reinstate Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/7/2009. (eds),(ps)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Respondents dismissing petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/23/09. (elc),(ps)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Indefinite Statements ; denying 10 Petition for Adjudication; 11 Motion to Amend ; denying 12 Motion to Disqualify Judge ; dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/09. (elc),(ps)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that petitioner may have until August 20, 2009, to supplement his petition to show that a motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 would be inadequate. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/7/2009. (eds),(ps)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that petitioner may have until August 10, 2009, to file an amended signature page and supplement to his petition. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/23/2009. (eds),(ps)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on ifp request: Petitioner to submit six-month trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee by 7/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/8/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Holinka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Felix Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carol Holinka
Represented By: Stephen E-file Only Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Article II Sworn Official(s) of the Department of Justice
Represented By: Stephen E-file Only Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?