Chang v. PN Credit Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chai Chang
Defendant: PN Credit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00557
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT in favor of Chai Chang against PN Credit Services, Inc. in the amount of $ 5,419.50 plus interest on the judgment at the legal rate until judgment is satisfied. (BBC / PAO) (elc),(ps)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Strike defendant's answer and brief opposing plaintiff's motion for entry of default. Defendant has until 1/22/10 to file a motion to vacate the entry of default and a new answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/4/10. (elc),(ps)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 12/7/2009. (llj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang v. PN Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chai Chang
Represented By: Larry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PN Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?