Jacobs v. Huibregtse
Petitioner: Chris J Jacobs, III
Respondent: Peter Huibregtse
Case Number: 3:2009cv00652
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration because this court lacks jurisdiction to entertain it. The clerk of court shall forward petitioner's motion to the court of appeals for its review. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/17/10. (elc),(ps)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Appeal not certified to be taken in good faith. Petitioner's Request for certificate of appealability denied. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/2/10. (elc),(ps)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Respondent Peter Huibregtse dismissing the case without prejudice. ( LAK) (elc),(ps)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/17/2009. (eds),(ps)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order : Petitioner to submit six-month trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee and completed 2254 petition on the court's form by 12/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Huibregtse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chris J Jacobs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Huibregtse
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?