Macias-Martinez v. Holinka
Petitioner: Guadalupe Macias-Martinez
Respondent: Holinka
Case Number: 3:2009cv00691
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Respondent Holinka dismissing the petition for a writ of habeas corpus for petitioner's failure to show he is custody in violation of the Constitution or laws of the United States. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/18/10. (elc),(ps)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Petitioner has until 1/11/2010 to provide additional evidence showing that Respondent denied him sentence credit. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/14/2009. (eds),(ps)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on ifp request: Petitioner to submit six-month trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee by 12/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/17/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macias-Martinez v. Holinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Guadalupe Macias-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Holinka
Represented By: Stephen E-file Only Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?