Allen v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Harold W. Allen
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv00753
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order that the $350 filing fee cannot be returned. Plaintiff may move the court to reopen this case, once he has received a final decision from the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/13/2010. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant dismissing the case. ( PAO) (eds),(ps)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/1/2010. (eds),(ps)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order allowing Plaintiff until 5/21/2010 to pay remaining $100 of the $350 filing fee and to submit additional information regarding Commissioner's final decision. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/6/2010. (eds),(ps)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that plaintiff has until 4/21/2010 to pay the $350 filing fee or submit additional information. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/8/2010. (eds),(ps)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Michael J. Astrue dismissing the case without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/14/10. (elc),(ps)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on ifp request: plaintiff denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Full filing fee due by 1/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/16/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Richard D. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?