White v. State Of Wisconsin Department Of Revenue
Plaintiff: Lea N. White
Defendant: State Of Wisconsin Department Of Revenue
Case Number: 3:2009cv00755
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant State Of Wisconsin Department Of Revenue dismissing this case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file her materials in response to defendants' motion for summary judgment, dkt. 47 , is GRANTED; plaintiff may have until April 22, 2011 to file her materials. Defendant may have un til April 29, 2011 to file a supplemental reply. Defendant may have until April 21, 2011 to file a response to plaintiff's 47 allegations regarding the state's failure provide the requested affirmative action report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/14/2011. (jef),(ps)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may have until 10/22/2010 to identify the relief she is seeking. If plaintiff does not respond by that date, I will assume that plaintiff is seeking all forms of relief that are authorized by law. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/8/2010. (jef),(ps)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting 7 Request for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/2010. (eds),(ps)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on ifp request: plaintiff to submit proposed amended complaint that complies with Rule 8 by 2/16/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/1/10. (elc),(ps)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on ifp request: Plaintiff to pay $ 175.00 prepayment of the filing fee due 1/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. State Of Wisconsin Department Of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea N. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Wisconsin Department Of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?