NewPage Wisconsin System, Inc. et al v. United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Mfg. Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al.
Plaintiff: |
NewPage Wisconsin System, Inc. and NPWSI Retiree Health Plan |
Defendant: |
United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Mfg. Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, William Clendenning, Lawrence Bierstaker, Bernard Rouse and Gary Dollevoet |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00041 |
Filed: |
January 29, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Wood |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2010 |
Filing
37
JUDGMENT entered dismissing claim for declaratory relief under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and declining to exercise jurisdiction over plaintiffs' claim for declaratory relief under the Labor Management Relations Act. (PAO) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 7/19/2010. (llj)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER dismissing claim in Count II of the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; declining to exercise jurisdiction over the claim in Count I of the complaint. Action dismissed and judgment to be entered. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/16/2010. (llj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: NewPage Wisconsin System, Inc. et al v. United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Mfg. Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: NewPage Wisconsin System, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Michael Mishlove |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: NPWSI Retiree Health Plan |
Represented By: |
Michael Mishlove |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: United Steel, Paper & Forestry, Rubber, Mfg. Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: William Clendenning |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lawrence Bierstaker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bernard Rouse |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Gary Dollevoet |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?