Skorychenko, Ludmyla v. Tompkins, Ernest
Plaintiff: Ludmyla Skorychenko
Defendant: Ernest F. Tompkins
Case Number: 3:2010cv00187
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 8:287 Petition to Enforce INS Subpoena
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying plaintiff Ludmyla Carlborg's 40 motion to initiate garnishment proceedings against Ernest Tompkin's social security benefits. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/4/2011. (jef),(ps)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Ludmyla Carlborg against Ernest F. Tompkins in the amount of $6320.96. (BBC / PAO). (jef),(ps)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT in favor of Ludmyla Carlborg against Ernest F. Tompkins in the amount of $6320.96. ( PAO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/5/2010. (jef),(ps)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying plaintiff's 24 Motion to Strike; granting plaintiff's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment against Ernest Tompkins in the amount $6320.96 and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/3/2010. (jef),(ps)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order staying a decision and resetting deadlines as to plaintiff's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Plaintiff's Supplement to Summary Judgment due 9/8/2010, Brief in Opposition due 9/22/2010, Brief in Reply due 9/29/2010). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/24/2010. (jef),(ps)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order that plaintiff file responsive pleading re 6 Counterclaim filed by Ernest F. Tompkins. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/24/2010. (eds),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skorychenko, Ludmyla v. Tompkins, Ernest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludmyla Skorychenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest F. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?