Streight, Mark v. Bay Area Credit Service
Plaintiff: Mark Streight
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Service
Case Number: 3:2010cv00191
Filed: April 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Judicial Determination - defendant has waived service of the summons ; denying 11 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/30/10. (elc),(ps)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that plaintiff Mark Streight file response in writing indicating what steps he has taken to serve his complaint. Response due 7/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/6/2010. (eds),(ps)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Plaintiff directed to serve complaint. Proof of service due 6/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/27/2010. (eds),(ps)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order denying plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis because plaintiff does not qualify for indigent status. Plaintiff has until 5/11/2010 to pay the $350 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/20/10. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streight, Mark v. Bay Area Credit Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Streight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?