Maddox, Cornelius v. Pollard, William et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Maddox
Defendant: William Pollard, Baenen, Peter Ericksen, Lesatz, Brant, Stutleen, W. Bruns, D. Mosher, Maleah Cummings and M. Armantae
Case Number: 3:2010cv00831
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that the request by plaintiff Cornelius Maddox for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED at this time for failure to comply with 28 U.S.C.§ l915(a)(2). For his appeal to proceed, Maddox must file a properly supported motio n for leave to proceed without prepayment of the appellate filing fee in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § l 915(a)(2), together with a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six month s, within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. Maddox is advised that if he does not comply as directed, the clerk of court will alert the Seventh Circuit, which may result in the dismissal of his appeal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 66 Motion for Extension of Time to file notice of appeal and to rescind the Rule 59(e) motion. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/16/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting defendants' 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/24/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 118.29 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/12/2011. (jef),(ps)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 7/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/22/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox, Cornelius v. Pollard, William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baenen
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ericksen
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesatz
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stutleen
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Bruns
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mosher
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maleah Cummings
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Armantae
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?